Global Patent Index - EP 1019920 A4

EP 1019920 A4 2001-02-28 - SUBSTRATES WITH IMPROVED OXIDATION RESISTANCE

Title (en)

SUBSTRATES WITH IMPROVED OXIDATION RESISTANCE

Title (de)

SUBSTRATEN MIT ERHÖHTER OXIDATIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

SUBSTRATS POSSEDANT UNE RESISTANCE ACCRUE A L'OXYDATION

Publication

EP 1019920 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98957311 A

Priority

  • US 9820404 W
  • US 94304797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917307A1] An alloy article having improved oxidation resistance and biaxially textured surfaces formed by thermo-mechanical techniques has up to 60 atomic % nickel, 0.1 to 25 atomic % of an oxide former selected from Mg, Al, Ti, Cr, Ga, Ge, Zr, Hf, Y, Si, Pr, Eu, Gd, Tb, Dy, Ho, Lu, Th, Er, Tm, Be, Ce, Nd, Sm, Yb, La, and mixtures thereof, with the balance copper. The surface smoothness of the article may be improved by thermomechanical techniques without impairing its surface texture. The CTE of the article may be reduced and its mechanical strength increased by incorportation of additional materials into the article without impairing its surface texture. The alloy article is useful as a conductive substrate for superconducting composites where the substrate is coated with a superconducting oxide. Methods of producing the alloy article by melting and sheath and core thechniques are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 12/02; B22F 1/00; B22F 3/18; B22F 7/02; B32B 15/04; B32B 18/00; C04B 35/00; C04B 35/622; H01L 39/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 15/04 (2006.01); B22F 7/08 (2006.01); B32B 18/00 (2006.01); C22C 9/00 (2006.01); C22C 9/06 (2006.01); C22C 19/03 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/08 (2006.01); H01B 12/06 (2006.01); H01B 13/00 (2006.01); H01L 39/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 9/06 (2013.01); B22F 7/08 (2013.01); C22C 32/0021 (2013.01); H01L 39/2454 (2013.01); C22C 2204/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0392659 A2 19901017 - GEN ATOMICS [US]
  • [X] DE 19501223 A1 19960718 - KOREA MACHINERY & METAL INST [KR]
  • [A] US 4927788 A 19900522 - NAKASHIMA KAZUTAKA [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 309 (C - 1070) 14 June 1993 (1993-06-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 01 28 February 1995 (1995-02-28)
  • See also references of WO 9917307A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917307 A1 19990408; AU 1359799 A 19990423; AU 740508 B2 20011108; CA 2305646 A1 19990408; EP 1019920 A1 20000719; EP 1019920 A4 20010228; JP 2001518681 A 20011016; NZ 504011 A 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01B 12/02 A, 7B 32B 15/04 B, 7B 32B 18/00 B, 7C 04B 35/622 B, 7B 22F 1/00 B, 7B 22F 3/18 B, 7B 22F 7/02 B, 7H 01L 39/24 B, 7C 04B 35/00 B

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE