Global Patent Index - EP 1019922 B1

EP 1019922 B1 2002-11-13 - TRANSFORMER/REACTOR

Title (en)

TRANSFORMER/REACTOR

Title (de)

TRANSFORMATOR/DROSSELSPULE

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATEUR/REACTEUR

Publication

EP 1019922 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946760 A

Priority

  • SE 9801744 W
  • SE 9703558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917311A2] The invention refers to a power transformer/reactor having a high voltage winding (2, 3) wound around a core (1). The transformer/reactor is a so-called dry type of transformer, i.e. air-cooled. According to the invention the high voltage winding is divided into a first section (2) and a second section (3) in series to each other. The winding is electrically connected (4, 5) to the core (1) between both these sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01); H01F 30/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/323 (2013.01); H01F 27/288 (2013.01); H01F 30/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917311 A2 19990408; WO 9917311 A3 19990617; AU 9370998 A 19990423; DE 69809460 D1 20021219; DE 69809460 T2 20031023; EP 1019922 A2 20000719; EP 1019922 B1 20021113; SE 511363 C2 19990920; SE 9703558 D0 19970930; SE 9703558 L 19990331

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050929

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050929

2004-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809460 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI