Global Patent Index - EP 1019926 A1

EP 1019926 A1 2000-07-19 - INDUCTIVE COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

INDUCTIVE COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

INDUKTIVES BAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN BAUELEMENTS

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT INDUCTIF ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL COMPOSANT

Publication

EP 1019926 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97943031 A

Priority

FR 9701727 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917318A1] The invention concerns an inductive component designed to be mounted on a printed circuit, comprising: at least a winding (4) of an electrically conductive wire coiled in the form of a flat winding whereof the ends (41) are connected to the inner ends (24) of bonding pads (2); a body (1), formed of an insulating material block over-moulded on the winding and on said inner ends of the pads, the body comprising a central opening (13) running through it along the winding axis; a ferrite magnetic core (3) enclosing the body in a median plane (P) containing the winding axis and a central element (33) passing in the body opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/12; H01F 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/04 (2006.01); H01F 27/29 (2006.01); H01F 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/043 (2013.01); H01F 27/292 (2013.01); H01F 41/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917318A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917318 A1 19990408; DE 69729127 D1 20040617; DE 69729127 T2 20041028; EP 1019926 A1 20000719; EP 1019926 B1 20040512; US 6486763 B1 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170414

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69729127 P 20040617

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB