Global Patent Index - EP 1019929 A1

EP 1019929 A1 2000-07-19 - ELECTRIC SWITCH FOR DEVICES

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SWITCH FOR DEVICES

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER FÜR GERÄTE

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTRIQUE POUR APPAREILS

Publication

EP 1019929 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944425 A

Priority

  • SI 9800020 W
  • SI 9700256 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918589A1] A switch for devices, which can be arranged with a fuse with a fuse-link or without a fuse, basically consists of a housing (1) having two equal halves (2), whereat both housings differ in that the housing with a fuse is extended for the width of a bed (3) for a fuse-link (4). In both halves (2) of the housing (1) there are beds (6, 7, 8) in the shape of ribs for fixed contacts (9, 10) and a contact (11) of the fuse-link (4). A moving contact (12) is guided in rib guides (13), supported by a spring (14) and directly controlled by a rod (15). On its opposite side the rod (15) reaches into a break handle (17), with which the switch is manually broken. The handle (17) has bearings on an axle (18) lying in both halves (2) of the housing (1). The rod (15) is near the handle (17) guided in each half (2) of the housing (1) by an arch-shaped rib (21), the centre of which lies in the centre of the axle (18). In both halves (2) of the housing (1) there are arch-shaped wings (26) near the axle (18) with the centre of their arch lying concentrically to the axle (18) or to the rib (21), which are arranged with an indentation (27) as a bed of the rod (15) with the contacts open. An arch (19) is eccentrically positioned with respect to the axle (18) or to the wing (26) so that in the position of the handle (17) with the electric contacts open, one end of the arch (19) lies near the limit fence (20) between the indentation (27) and the axle (18) and the opposite end of the arch (19) lies near the limit fence (20') on the imaginary arch-shaped extension of the wing (26) via the indentation (27). In the most open position of the handle (17), the rod (15) perfectly fits into the indentation (27) and the handle (17) is free of the force of the spring (14) exerted via the rod (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/10; H01H 21/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/10 (2006.01); H01H 21/16 (2006.01); H01H 71/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H01H (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/16 (2013.01); H01H 9/104 (2013.01); H01H 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918589A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918589 A1 19990415; AT 213868 T 20020315; AU 9196498 A 19990427; BR 9812709 A 20000822; CZ 20001176 A3 20000816; CZ 297167 B6 20060913; DE 69803997 D1 20020404; DE 69803997 T2 20020919; DK 1019929 T3 20020617; EP 1019929 A1 20000719; EP 1019929 B1 20020227; ES 2175772 T3 20021116; HR P20000178 A2 20011031; HU 0004530 A2 20010428; HU 0004530 A3 20010628; IL 135372 D0 20010520; MY 124173 A 20060630; PL 339653 A1 20010102; SI 9700256 A 19990630; SK 286018 B6 20080107; SK 4792000 A3 20001009; YU 19400 A 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020227

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051001

2006-10-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-06-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-05-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-10-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-01 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-16 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ETI ELEKTROELEMENT D.D.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175772

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-26 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020401650

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-09-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020912

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020912

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-05-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69803997

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-04

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000428;LV PAYMENT 20000428;MK PAYMENT 20000428;RO PAYMENT 20000428

2002-02-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 213868

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETI ELEKTROELEMENT D.D.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SEMROV, ANTON

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000428;LV PAYMENT 20000428;MK PAYMENT 20000428;RO PAYMENT 20000428