Global Patent Index - EP 1019930 A1

EP 1019930 A1 2000-07-19 - ELECTRIC CIRCUIT PROTECTION DEVICE HAVING ELECTRICAL PARTS ULTRASONICALLY JOINED USING A BRAZING ALLOY

Title (en)

ELECTRIC CIRCUIT PROTECTION DEVICE HAVING ELECTRICAL PARTS ULTRASONICALLY JOINED USING A BRAZING ALLOY

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTUNGSSCHUTZEINRICHTUNG MIT ULTRASCHALL GESCHWEISSTEN ELEKTRISCHE UNTER BENÜTZUNG VON EINER HARTLÖTLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE CIRCUITS ELECTRIQUES COMPORTANT DES PARTIES ELECTRIQUES JOINTES PAR ULTRASONS AU MOYEN D'UN ALLIAGE DE BRASAGE

Publication

EP 1019930 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947169 A

Priority

  • US 9819613 W
  • US 94133797 A
  • US 94133497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917321A1] An electric circuit protection device comprising an interruptable current path for interrupting current flow to a load including trip means for tripping the interruptable current path upon occurrence of a load fault, the interruptable current path comprising first and second electrically conductive parts that have been joined by ultrasonic welding to establish electric conductivity between them, the first part comprising non-alloying material, the second part comprising non-ferrous material, and a brazing material that has been acted upon by the ultrasonic welding to join the parts, the brazing material being selected to comprise at least two materials, one of the two materials being elemental copper, and the elemental copper being the largest single constituent of the brazing material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/023 (2006.01); H01H 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/0231 (2013.01); H01H 11/042 (2013.01); H01H 1/5822 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917321A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917321 A1 19990408; DE 69814432 D1 20030612; DE 69814432 T2 20040318; DE 69819791 D1 20031218; DE 69819791 T2 20040923; EP 1019930 A1 20000719; EP 1019930 B1 20030507; EP 1261000 A1 20021127; EP 1261000 B1 20031112; ES 2199463 T3 20040216; ES 2211852 T3 20040716

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040922

2005-09-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040921

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199463 T3

2003-11-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030912

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814432 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF ULTRASONICALLY JOINING TWO ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE PARTS

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF ULTRASONICALLY JOINING TWO ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE PARTS

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT