Global Patent Index - EP 1020042 A1

EP 1020042 A1 2000-07-19 - USING MULTIPLE ANTENNAS TO MITIGATE SPECULAR REFLECTION

Title (en)

USING MULTIPLE ANTENNAS TO MITIGATE SPECULAR REFLECTION

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG MEHRERER ANTENNEN ZUR SCHWÄCHUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENREFLEKTIONEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE PLUSIEURS ANTENNES POUR LIMITER LA REFLEXION SPECULAIRE

Publication

EP 1020042 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954928 A

Priority

  • US 9820076 W
  • US 93932597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917466A1] Apparatus and method for using multiple receive antennas (420A, 420B) in a satellite communication system (100) receiver (500, 700, 900) to mitigate the effects of specular reflection (202B, 402B) of a received signal (202A, 402A). The system includes first and second antennas (420A, 420B), for receiving a satellite communication signal along first and second direct (202A, 402A) and specular propagation paths (202B, 402B), respectively, and a digital maximal ration combiner (520) for combining the signals (202A, 202B, 402A, 402B, 420A, 420B) so as to maximize the signal-to-noise of the resultant combined signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H04B 7/08 (2006.01); H04B 7/216 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/0894 (2013.01); H04B 7/0865 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917466A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917466 A1 19990408; WO 9917466 A9 19990624; AU 1185299 A 19990423; CA 2303540 A1 19990408; CN 1115800 C 20030723; CN 1281603 A 20010124; EP 1020042 A1 20000719; JP 2001518736 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031052

2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040422

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THOMPSON, JAMES, H.

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PANTON, WILLIAM, R.

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TASSOUDJI, MOHAMMAD, ALI

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE