Global patent index - EP 1020101 A1

EP 1020101 A1 2000-07-19 - PARTICLE ACCELERATOR CAVITY WITH REINFORCED SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

PARTICLE ACCELERATOR CAVITY WITH REINFORCED SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

TEILCHENBESCHLEUNIGER-HOHLRAUM MIT VERSTÄRKTEM SUPRALEITENDEM MATERIAL, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

CAVITE D'ACCELERATEUR DE PARTICULES AVEC MATERIAU SUPRACONDUCTEUR RENFORCE, ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION

Publication

EP 1020101 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98946511 A

Priority

  • FR 9802068 W
  • FR 9712079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769167A1] The invention concerns a method for making a rigidized structure comprising at least an element with supraconductive properties, and rigidizing means, said method comprising a step consisting in depositing by plasma spraying a layer of material on the surface of said element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917592A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769167 A1 19990402; FR 2769167 B1 19991217; DE 69829396 D1 20050421; DE 69829396 T2 20060413; EP 1020101 A1 20000719; EP 1020101 B1 20050316; US 6348757 B1 20020219; WO 9917592 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-06-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69829396

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PARTICLE ACCELERATOR CAVITY WITH REINFORCED SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT