Global Patent Index - EP 1020126 A1

EP 1020126 A1 2000-07-19 - Method and apparatus for conveying cigarettes

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for conveying cigarettes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Fördern von Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour transporter des cigarettes

Publication

EP 1020126 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100060 A

Priority

DE 19901248 A

Abstract (en)

A method for controlling the flow of cigarettes from a process line into containers, sorting shafts etc. The cigarettes are loaded into the main container (10) by a gravity feed and fall into the separate compartments. The cigarettes fall onto mechanical guides (23) which are moved downwards to increase the volume of the compartments in a progressive manner, to the maximum value. This ensures a controlled loading of the compartments with no damage to the cigarettes. The filled compartments are transferred to a gravity fed loading station for the packing system. An Independent claim is included for apparatus to implement the method.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Handhabung von Zigaretten im Bereich einer Zigaretten-Verpackungsmaschine oder dergleichen ist die Erstbefüllung von Behältern, Förderstrecken und Zigarettenmagazin (12) problematisch, weil die Zigaretten (21) während des Betriebs der Anlage weitgehend durch Eigengewicht gefördert werden. Um beim Füllen der Anlage mit Zigaretten Beeinträchtigungen derselben zu vermeiden, sind den Behältern (10), Förderstrecken (11) und dem Zigarettenmagazin (12) Stütz- und Führungsorgane (23,41,56,57) zugeordnet, die innerhalb der (leeren) Räume nach Maßgabe des Füllvorgangs abwärts oder horizontal bewegt werden, so dass die Zigaretten unter Abstützung und Führung in den entsprechenden Raum gelangen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/356; A24C 5/35; B65B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/35 (2006.01); A24C 5/356 (2006.01); B65B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/04 (2013.01); A24C 5/35 (2013.01); A24C 5/356 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020126 A1 20000719; EP 1020126 B1 20040526; BR 0000069 A 20001003; CN 1183005 C 20050105; CN 1261040 A 20000726; DE 19901248 A1 20000720; DE 19901248 B4 20120719; JP 2000211608 A 20000802; JP 4757975 B2 20110824; US 6540061 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006540

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160105

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160105

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160105

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-12-06 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060730

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: G.D. SOCIETAE PER AZIONI

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-05-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: G.D. SOCIETAE PER AZIONI

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006540 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR CONVEYING CIGARETTES

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI