Global Patent Index - EP 1020129 A1

EP 1020129 A1 2000-07-19 - Shirt and necktie

Title (en)

Shirt and necktie

Title (de)

Hemd und Krawatte

Title (fr)

Chemise et cravate

Publication

EP 1020129 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124989 A

Priority

DE 19900606 A

Abstract (en)

Shirt (2) has at least one piece of velour material (4, 4') on the side of the tie, which is equipped with a piece of Velcro (RTM: hook and loop fastener) material. The strip-like velour material (4') runs along the button hole strip (7). The Velcro (RTM) material is on the side of the tie facing the shirt (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Hemd und Krawatte. Der Kern der Erfindung besteht darin, daß das Hemd (2) krawattenseitig mindestens ein Stück (4) eines Velourstoffes (4') und die Krawate (1) hemdseitig mindestens ein Stück (5) aus Klettmaterial (5') aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 25/00; A41B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 1/08 (2006.01); A41D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 1/08 (2013.01); A41D 25/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020129 A1 20000719; DE 19900606 C1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020925

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI