Global Patent Index - EP 1020132 A1

EP 1020132 A1 2000-07-19 - Method of removing a pull tab from a slide fastener

Title (en)

Method of removing a pull tab from a slide fastener

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Entfernen einer Zuglasche für einen Reissverschluss

Title (fr)

Procédé pour éloigner une tirette pour un curseur de fermeture

Publication

EP 1020132 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300127 A

Priority

GB 9900623 A

Abstract (en)

A detachable pull tab 2 for a slide fastener 4 has spindle 18 which pivots within a locking member 24 and cover 36 on a slider 10 of the fastener 4. The spindle 18 is supported only at one end, on a leg 14 which extends from a gripping portion 6 of the pull tab 2. To detach the pull tab, the gripping portion 6 is twisted, causing the leg 14 to deform or twist, and opening a gap 21 at the free end of the spindle 18. The pull tab 2 can then be easily removed from the slider 10. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020132 A1 20000719; EP 1020132 B1 20040407; CN 1178606 C 20041208; CN 1264557 A 20000830; DE 60009581 D1 20040513; DE 60009581 T2 20050421; ES 2216818 T3 20041101; GB 2345726 A 20000719; ID 27121 A 20010301; PT 1020132 E 20040730

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60009581

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100112

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110225

2011-07-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2011-03-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *YKK EUROPE LTD

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-08 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216818 T3

2004-09-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009581 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB PT

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK SI

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF REMOVING A PULL TAB FROM A SLIDE FASTENER

2003-11-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF REMOVING A PULL TAB FROM A SLIDE FASTENER

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB PT

2001-04-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001124;LT PAYMENT 20001124;LV PAYMENT 20001124;MK PAYMENT 20001124;SI PAYMENT 20001124

2001-01-24 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB PT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI