Global Patent Index - EP 1020140 A1

EP 1020140 A1 2000-07-19 - Sitting-furniture

Title (en)

Sitting-furniture

Title (de)

Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise

Publication

EP 1020140 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125846 A

Priority

DE 19901427 A

Abstract (en)

The armrest (15) is movable from a horizontal position where it covers or overlaps part of the seat surface into a roughly vertical position where it can act as a head rest. When changing from the horizontal to the vertical position the end area (32) of the armrest remote from the seat in the vertical position is raised and the end area (36) adjoining the seat is moved roughly parallel to the seat. The arm rest is held on a frame (22) of the seat through an adjustment mechanism.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Sitzmöbel mit einer Sitzfläche (14) und mindestens einer verstellbaren Armstütze (15) in der Weise auszugestalten, daß sich eine Person sowohl in sitzender als auch in liegender Stellung bequem an der Armstütze (15) abstützen kann, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Armstütze (15) aus einer im wesentlichen horizontalen Stellung in eine ungefähr vertikale Stellung verstellbar ist, wobei sie in ihrer im wesentlichen horizontalen Stellung die Sitzfläche (14) teilweise überdeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020140 A1 20000719; DE 19901427 C1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030344

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-12-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021017

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI