Global Patent Index - EP 1020145 A1

EP 1020145 A1 2000-07-19 - Mattress cover with negligible noise tendancy

Title (en)

Mattress cover with negligible noise tendancy

Title (de)

Matratzenhülle mit geringerer Raschelneigung

Title (fr)

Housse de matelas avec faible propension au bruit

Publication

EP 1020145 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100367 A

Priority

DE 19900866 A

Abstract (en)

A mattress cover, including a water vapor pervious, allergen- and water-tight thin flexible barrier film or membrane having a specified work capacity, is new. A cover for mattresses or the like includes a water vapor pervious, allergen- and water-tight barrier layer in the form of a 5-40 mu thick flexible film or membrane with a work capacity of 150-400 MJ/m<2>. An Independent claim is also included for a mattress with the above cover. Preferred Features: The barrier layer is separated from a textile sheet by a nonwoven padding comprising long synthetic fibers bonded by a fused synthetic adhesive.

Abstract (de)

Hülle für Matratzen oder dergleichen, enthaltend eine wasserdampfdurchlässige, allergen- und wasserdichte Barriereschicht, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Barriereschicht ein Arbeitsvermögen von 150 bis 400 MJ/m<2> aufweist und zumindestens überwiegend aus einer flexiblen Folie oder Membran mit einer Dicke von 5 bis 40 µm besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 21/06; D04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/06 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/60 (2013.01); A47C 27/006 (2013.01); A47C 31/007 (2013.01); D04H 1/4282 (2013.01); D04H 1/4334 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/587 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020145 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010626

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMPATEX TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI