Global patent index - EP 1020149 A3

EP 1020149 A3 2000-11-02 - Method to control refrigeration conditions of refrigerated modules and device to achieve said method

Title (en)

Method to control refrigeration conditions of refrigerated modules and device to achieve said method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Steuern der Kältebedingungen in Kühleinheiten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la commande des conditions frigorifiques dans des modules refroidis

Publication

EP 1020149 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00100725 A

Priority

  • IT UD990005 A
  • IT UD990006 A
  • IT UD990007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020149A2] Method and device to control refrigeration conditions in refrigerated showcases, modules (10) or similar, said refrigerated modules comprising at least a front glass (11), a refrigerated compartment, a cooling circuit (17), antimisting devices (32) and a cooling assembly (40), it being provided, during functioning, to measure at least the values of temperature of the air (21) entering and leaving the evaporator unit (13), to compare them with pre-determined threshold values and to give permission to start a defrosting cycle to defrost the evaporator unit (13) only when the continuously measured values reach the threshold values. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04; F25D 21/06; F25D 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); F25D 21/00 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0404 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01); F25D 21/002 (2013.01); F25D 29/00 (2013.01); F25B 2700/02 (2013.01); F25B 2700/11 (2013.01); F25B 2700/111 (2013.01); F25D 2400/36 (2013.01); F25D 2700/14 (2013.01); F25D 2700/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020149 A2 20000719; EP 1020149 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021119

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI