Global Patent Index - EP 1020150 A1

EP 1020150 A1 2000-07-19 - Garment hanger

Title (en)

Garment hanger

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre pour vêtements

Publication

EP 1020150 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100506 A

Priority

DE 19900777 A

Abstract (en)

The clothes hanger has a bored tube (5) into which the shaft end (4) of the hook is fitted. The tube has a groove (8) which carries a cross piece (7) mounted on a pivot (9). When this is fastened the hook (3) is maintained in a position parallel to the arm portions (1) of the hanger.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Kleiderbügel mit einem Tragbügel und einer mit einem Hakenteil, einem Schaftteil und einer im Tragbügel angeordneten Aufnahmebohrung für das Schaftteil versehenen Aufhängevorrichtung, wobei das Schaftteil in der Aufnahmebohrung drehbar und geringfügig in Längsrichtung der Aufnahmebohrung verschiebbar ist, vorgestellt, bei dem das Schaftteil (4) an seinem dem Hakenteil (3) abgewandten unteren freien Ende einen über den Schaftquerschnitt vorstehenden länglichen Quersteg (7) aufweist und bei dem die Aufnahmebohrung (5) an ihrer, dem Schaftende zugewandten unteren Seite eine Ausnehmung (8) aufweist, in die der Quersteg (7) so festlegbar ist, daß das mit dem Quersteg (7) über das Schaftteil verbundene Hakenteil (3) eine zum Tragbügel (1) parallele Stellung einnimmt. Durch diese erfindungsgemäße Konstruktion ist ein langlebiger, insbesondere auf industriellen Verpackungsanlagen der Bekleidungsindustrie einsetzbarer Kleiderbügel offenbart, der auf einfache und kostengünstige Weise herstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900777 A1 20000713; DE 19900777 B4 20040212; EP 1020150 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041106

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI