Global patent index - EP 1020151 A2

EP 1020151 A2 2000-07-19 - Curtain rod mounting

Title (en)

Curtain rod mounting

Title (de)

Vorhangstangenhalterung

Title (fr)

Support de tringle à rideaux

Publication

EP 1020151 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100063 A

Priority

  • DE 29900254 U
  • DE 29909730 U

Abstract (en)

The holder element (2) in the form of a rod or pull-cable, is fixed at one end above a roller-blind casing to the wall or ceiling surface. When the holder is fixed, the holder extends from the assembly surface as far as the roller-blind casing. The other end of the holder element has a pipe or ring (5) for holding the curtain rod (1a,1b) the outer diameter of which is the same as that of the pipe.

Abstract (de)

Eine Halterung einer Vorhangstange (1a, 1b) kann im Bereich eines Rolladenkastens (14) waagerecht angeordnet werden. Die Halterung weist mindestens ein Halteelement (2; 22) auf, das einenends oberhalb des Rolladenkastens (14) an einer Montagefläche einer Wand (10; 24) oder Decke befestigbar ist und sich im befestigten Zustand der Halterung ausgehend von dem Montagebereich bis zum Bereich des Rolladenkastens (14) erstreckt. An dem Halteelement (2; 22) sind anderenends Mittel (5, 7; 36, 37, 38) zum Halten der Vorhangstange (1a, 1b) ausgebildet. Die Vorhangstange (1a, 1b) kann oberhalb einer Fensteröffnung in Höhe des Rolladenkastens angebracht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/122

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/102 (2006.01); A47H 1/142 (2006.01); A47H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/142 (2013.01); A47H 1/102 (2013.01); A47H 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020151 A2 20000719; EP 1020151 A3 20010425

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47H 1/122 A, 7A 47H 1/102 B, 7A 47H 1/142 B, 7A 47H 1/18 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI