Global Patent Index - EP 1020159 A2

EP 1020159 A2 2000-07-19 - Suction head for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Suction head for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger

Title (fr)

Suceur pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1020159 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124204 A

Priority

DE 29900713 U

Abstract (en)

The suction head (1) has the usual sole plate (2) and suction aperture (4) as well as a vertically moveable plate (5) behind, set by a lever (6), on which a plate (7) is covered by a fabric polishing material (8) for smooth floor surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger mit einem Gehäuseoberteil (1), einer am Gehäuseoberteil befestigten Gleitsohle (2) mit einem quer zur Arbeitsrichtung sich erstreckenden, von Saugmundkanten (3) begrenzten Saugmund (4) und einer im Gehäuseoberteil vertikal verstellbaren Trägerplatte (5). In der Unterseite der Trägerplatte (5) ist ein streifenförmiges Trag- und Dichtelement (7) angeordnet, das mit einer Stellbewegung der Trägerplatte (5) aus- und einfahrbar ist und beim Saugen auf Glattböden auf dem Boden gleitet. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Unterseite des Trag- und Dichtelementes (7) als breite Polierfläche ausgebildet und weist einen weichen, textilen Belag (8) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/0613 (2013.01); A47L 9/0653 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900713 U1 19990624; EP 1020159 A2 20000719; EP 1020159 A3 20001115; EP 1020159 B1 20020605; EP 1180340 A2 20020220; EP 1180340 A3 20020619; EP 1180340 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091203

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901610 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI