Global patent index - EP 1020173 A2

EP 1020173 A2 2000-07-19 - Walking aid

Title (en)

Walking aid

Title (de)

Gehwagen

Title (fr)

Déambulateur

Publication

EP 1020173 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124233 A

Priority

DE 29900419 U

Abstract (en)

The body support has at least one handle (62, 64) on which a brake control (74) is connected to the brakes of both rear wheels (14, 16). The brake control is accessible for the right or left hand. The frame has surfaces (50, 52) with an opening surrounding and supporting the torso. Height-and side-adjustable shoulder-rests (56, 58) swivel on a vertical axis. Two support wheels (22) are axially spaced apart from the driven front wheel (28).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Gehwagen (10) zum Unterstützen des Gehvorganges eines Menschen, mit einem Rahmen, an dem zwei hintere Räder (14, 16) mit Bremse und mindestens ein lenkbares vorderes Rad (28) angeordnet sind, der eine Vorrichtung zum Abstützen des Oberkörpers hat, und an dem mindestens ein Handgriff (62, 64) angeordnet ist, ist ein mit den Bremsen beider hinterer Räder (14, 16) verbundenes Bremsbetätigungsorgan (74) an dem Handgriff (64) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/04 (2013.01); A61H 2003/043 (2013.01); A61H 2003/046 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1614 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900419 U1 19990408; EP 1020173 A2 20000719; EP 1020173 A3 20010620

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020304

2002-04-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI