Global Patent Index - EP 1020207 A1

EP 1020207 A1 2000-07-19 - Apparatus for launching balls

Title (en)

Apparatus for launching balls

Title (de)

Ballschiessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil pour lancer des ballons

Publication

EP 1020207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100649 A

Priority

LU 90339 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a striking device for imparting a shock pulse to the ball and a ball holder (26) that produces a reproducible ejection ball position. The striking device can pivot in the horizontal plane about the ejection position by angle of less than 180 degrees. The ball firing device also has a viewing stop (22) that covers the pivotable striker so that only the ball (24) to be fired can be seen

Abstract (de)

Eine Ballschießvorrichtung umfaßt eine Stoßvorrichtung (40) zum Übertragen eines Stoßimpulses auf einen Ball (24) und eine Aufnahmevorrichtung (26) für den abzuschießenden Ball (24), welche für diesen Ball (24) eine Abschußposition reproduzierbar festlegt. Die Stoßvorrichtung (40) ist in einer horizontalen Ebene um einen Winkel kleiner als 180° um die Abschußposition schwenkbar. Die Ballschießvorrichtung umfaßt weiterhin eine Sichtblende (20), welche die schwenkbare Stoßvorrichtung (40) in Abschußrichtung derart verdeckt, daß lediglich der abzuschießende Ball (24) sichtbar ist. Die Ballschießvorrichtung ist insbesondere als automatische Elfmeter-Trainingsvorrichtung für Fußballtorwarte einsetzbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 69/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/40 (2006.01); A63B 69/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/409 (2013.01); A63B 69/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020207 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040609

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI