Global Patent Index - EP 1020231 A1

EP 1020231 A1 2000-07-19 - Spray head for product like paint

Title (en)

Spray head for product like paint

Title (de)

Sprühkopf für Medien wie Farbe

Title (fr)

Tête de pulvérisation d'un produit tel que de la peinture

Publication

EP 1020231 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402606 A

Priority

FR 9900179 A

Abstract (en)

The spray head comprises a main body unit (1) within which is contained the main fluid (7) and air (8,9) supply conduits. A threaded spigot enables a mounting collar (4) to be attached that retains the valve pin (16) and pin guide (3). A distribution head unit (5) is mounted to the mounting collar and secured by a lock ring assembly (6).

Abstract (fr)

Selon l'invention, la buse de pulvérisation (3) est guidée et maintenue dans la bague déflectrice (4), et l'étanchéité entre ladite buse (3) et le corps (1) est assurée par l'interposition d'un joint (2). Le chapeau de soufflage (5) est porté de façon amovible par ladite bague déflectrice (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/0815 (2013.01); B05B 7/2435 (2013.01); B05B 7/2478 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020231 A1 20000719; EP 1020231 B1 20040630; AU 1017100 A 20000713; AU 730603 B2 20010308; CA 2292681 A1 20000711; DE 69918403 D1 20040805; DE 69918403 T2 20050825; ES 2224572 T3 20050301; FR 2788231 A1 20000713; FR 2788231 B1 20010309; JP 2000202332 A 20000725; JP 3079108 B2 20000821; US 6230986 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101022

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-11-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69918403

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ITW SURFACES & FINITIONS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-11-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224572

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69918403

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI