Global Patent Index - EP 1020237 A1

EP 1020237 A1 2000-07-19 - A MILL FOR ROLLING STRIPS OR PLATES

Title (en)

A MILL FOR ROLLING STRIPS OR PLATES

Title (de)

WALZWERK ZUM WALZEN VON BÄNDERN ODER BLECHEN

Title (fr)

LAMINOIR POUR FEUILLARDS OU PRODUITS PLATS

Publication

EP 1020237 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97938744 A

Priority

CN 9700092 W

Abstract (en)

A mill for rolling strips or plates comprises frames of the rolling stand, upper and lower crossbeams, screw-down means, upper and lower roll groups and roll chocks. The upper/lower crossbeam is respectively mounted on the upper/lower side of the frames, to which the screw-down means are fixed, and the screw-down means are located at the end portions of the upper crossbeam to enable the latter to move for adjusting roll gap. The roll chocks and the upper and lower roll groups are arranged between the roll chocks and the crossbeams, and the bearings are provided between the upper/lower roll groups and the roll chocks. Both the bearings and the supporting blocks are positioned at the middle part of the rolls and in the area of the roll bodies. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/02; B21B 31/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2013.01); B21B 13/02 (2013.01); B21B 13/147 (2013.01); B21B 31/07 (2013.01); B21B 2013/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911396 A1 19990311; AT 282485 T 20041215; AU 4110397 A 19990322; AU 750839 B2 20020801; CA 2302424 A1 19990311; CA 2302424 C 20061114; DE 29780450 U1 20000504; DE 69731671 D1 20041223; DE 69731671 T2 20051201; EP 1020237 A1 20000719; EP 1020237 A4 20030416; EP 1020237 B1 20041117; RU 2198750 C2 20030220

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080904

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080904

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080904

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080904

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080904

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69731671 P 20041223

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT LU

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 13/02 A

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 31/07 B

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 13/14 B

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT LU