Global Patent Index - EP 1020239 A2

EP 1020239 A2 2000-07-19 - Method and installation for rolling metal strip

Title (en)

Method and installation for rolling metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum Walzen von Metallband

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour le laminage de bandes métalliques

Publication

EP 1020239 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100097 A

Priority

DE 19900779 A

Abstract (en)

Metal strip rolling process comprises cropping one or more leading and/or trailing end regions (4') of a thin slab before entry into the first stand. A metal strip rolling process comprises compensation of irregular finished strip dimensions and/or positions, arising during rolling of the leading and/or trailing end (18) of a thin slab, by using a cutting tool (30) to crop one or more end regions (4') from the slab before entry into the first stand. An Independent claim is also included for a metal strip rolling mill in which the above process is carried out. Preferred Features: Cropping is carried out by a cutting, milling, sawing and/or flame cutting operation.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Walzung von Metallband in einer Walzstraße, wobei ein Vorband bzw. eine Dünnbramme (14) in aufeinanderfolgenden Schritten zu einem Metallband ausgewalzt wird, ergeben sich häufig Walzfehler bei der Walzung des vorderen oder hinteren Endes (18) des Vorbandes bzw. der Dünnbramme (14). Diese Walzfehler (Bandendenverwalzung), die in Form einer unerwünschten Breitung oder einer Bandmittenabweichung auftreten, lassen sich gemäß der Erfindung dadurch vermeiden, dass vor dem Walzen entsprechend große Bereiche (4') des vorderen oder hinteren Endes (18) des Vorbandes bzw. der Dünnbramme (14) mit Hilfe einer Trennvorrichtung (30) während des Transportes des Vorbandes bzw. der Dünnbramme (14) abgetrennt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 15/0007 (2013.01); B21B 2263/20 (2013.01); B21B 2273/14 (2013.01); B21B 2273/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900779 A1 20000713; DE 19900779 B4 20100401; EP 1020239 A2 20000719; EP 1020239 A3 20030115

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI