Global Patent Index - EP 1020241 A2

EP 1020241 A2 2000-07-19 - Swaging machine

Title (en)

Swaging machine

Title (de)

Rundknetmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à rétreindre

Publication

EP 1020241 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890378 A

Priority

AT 205098 A

Abstract (en)

The rotating kneading machine (1), to squeeze tubular workpieces in a forging operation, has hammer units (5) which deliver pulsed hammer blows against the workpiece material. They are in radial openings (4) in a forging box (3) which rotates round the center axis (A), and pressure units are at a coaxial support ring (8) round it. The pressure units are a pressure plate (10) with a rocker movement on an axis (B) parallel to the center axis (A), with a limited swing movement. They are operated by a pressure die (9). The hammer units (5) have a head section towards the pressure plate (10), with a rocker movement on a swing axis (C) parallel to the center axis (A) and working with a counter pressure plate (13) with a limited swing movement. The pressure plates (10) and the counter pressure plates (13) together form sliding surfaces (16,17), held by return springs (18,19) at a forwards start angle under pressure in relation to the relative rotation (R) of the forging box (3) and support ring (8).

Abstract (de)

Eine Rundknetmaschine (1) umfaßt in radialen Ausnehmungen (4) eines um die Durchlaufachse (A) dreh- und antreibbar gelagerten Schmiedekastens (3) hubbewegbar geführten Hämmereinheiten (5) und sich an einem den Schmiedekasten (3) umgebenden koaxialen Stützring (8) abstützende Druckglieder, wobei der Schmiedekasten (3) und/oder der Stützring (8) relativ zueinander umlaufend antreibbar sind und die Druckglieder auf die mit einem Kopfteil in die Umlaufbahn der Druckglieder vorragenden Hämmereinheiten (5) beim jeweiligen Vorbeibewegen im Sinne eines einwärts gerichteten Druckimpulses einwirken. Um einen robusten, verschleißarmen Hubantrieb zu erreichen, bestehen die Druckglieder aus einer Druckplatte (10), die wippenartig um eine zur Durchlaufachse (A) parallele Wippachse (B) anschlagbegrenzt verschwenkbar an einem im Stützring (8) drehfest sitzenden Druckstempel (9) angelenkt ist, und weisen die Hämmereinheiten (5) als Kopfteil eine den Druckplatten (10) zugeordnete, wippenartig um eine zur Durchlaufachse (A) parallele Wippachse (C) anschlagbegrenzt verschwenkbare Gegendruckplatte (13) auf, wobei Druckplatten (10) und Gegendruckplatten (13) zusammenwirkende Gleitflächen (16, 17) bilden und über Rückstellfedern (18, 19) in Richtung einer bezüglich der jeweiligen Relativverdrehung (R) von Schmiedekasten (3) und Stützring (8) vorwärts geneigten Ausgangsstellung druckbeaufschlagbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020241 A2 20000719; EP 1020241 A3 20011031; EP 1020241 B1 20040225; AT 406646 B 20000725; AT A205098 A 19991215; DE 59908644 D1 20040401; US 6244087 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908644

- Representative's name: WOLF & WOLF PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GFM BETEILIGUNGS- UND MANAGEMENT GMBH & CO KG

- Free text: GFM BETEILIGUNGS- UND MANAGEMENT GMBH & CO KG#ENNSER STRASE 14#4403 STEYR (AT) -TRANSFER TO- GFM BETEILIGUNGS- UND MANAGEMENT GMBH & CO KG#ENNSER STRASE 14#4403 STEYR (AT)

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-02-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040605

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908644 P 20040401

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2004-02-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEEBER, ALFRED

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLAIMSCHEIN, GOTTFRIED

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 7/14 A, 7B 21J 7/16 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI