Global patent index - EP 1020255 A2

EP 1020255 A2 2000-07-19 - Tool for use in replacing the pads of disk brakes

Title (en)

Tool for use in replacing the pads of disk brakes

Title (de)

Werkzeug zum Ersetzen von Bremsbelägen

Title (fr)

Outil pour le remplacement de patins de freins

Publication

EP 1020255 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830812 A

Priority

IT FI990004 A

Abstract (en)

The tool comprises a pair of tapered spreader elements (11, 13) which are integral, respectively, with the piston (15) and with the cylinder (17) of an air jack (19); guide means (11B, 13B) keep the elements (11, 13) facing each other in the same angular position with respect to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/0021 (2013.01); B25B 27/0035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020255 A2 20000719; EP 1020255 A3 20010425; IT 1309993 B1 20020205; IT FI990004 A1 20000710; IT FI990004 D0 19990108

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 25B 27/00 A, 7B 60T 17/22 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI