Global Patent Index - EP 1020266 A2

EP 1020266 A2 2000-07-19 - Device for making ceramic articles

Title (en)

Device for making ceramic articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Herstellung von Keramikrohlingen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication d'articles en céramique

Publication

EP 1020266 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100459 A

Priority

DE 19901533 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a roller device (1) for producing a dividable material strip (9) in the blank part, has a device contg. at least one application roller (4-16) for applying decorative and/or glazing material to the material strip. A pattern can be transferred from the application roller to the material strip. An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing ceramic blank parts, esp. tiles.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung für die Herstellung von Keramikrohlingen, insbesondere Fliesenrohlingen, mit einer Walzeinrichtung (1) zum Erzeugen einer in die Keramikrohlinge zerteilbaren Materialbahn (9) sowie ein entsprechendes Verfahren für die Herstellung von Keramikrohlingen. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Walzeinrichtung (1) eine wenigstens eine Auftragswalze (11-13) umfassende Einrichtung zum Aufbringen von Dekor- oder/und Glasurmasse auf die Materialbahn (9) nachgeordnet. Gemäß dem erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren wird auf die gewalzte Bahn (9) über eine Walze Dekor- oder/und Glasurmaterial aufgetragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/08; B28B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/12 (2006.01); B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01); B28B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/123 (2013.01); B28B 11/001 (2013.01); B28B 11/044 (2013.01); B28B 11/046 (2013.01); B28B 11/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020266 A2 20000719; EP 1020266 A3 20020731; DE 19901533 A1 20000727; DE 19901533 C2 20030410

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050802

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28B 11/08 A, 7B 28B 3/12 B, 7B 28B 11/04 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI