Global Patent Index - EP 1020268 A3

EP 1020268 A3 2000-10-04 - A device for manufacturing a fence post of mouldable material, and fence post provided with a shoulder

Title (en)

A device for manufacturing a fence post of mouldable material, and fence post provided with a shoulder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Zaunpfählen aus einem giessbaren Material und Zaunpfahl mit einer Schulter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de poteaux pour clôture à partir d'un matériau coulable et poteau pour clôture muni d'un épaulement

Publication

EP 1020268 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200064 A

Priority

NL 1010987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020268A2] A device for manufacturing a fence post of mouldable material and provided with a reinforcement (12), which device comprises at least a multipart mould (1) with infeed (5) and air release opening (6), wherein the mould (1) is embodied with a lost part (11) on a longitudinal partition plane thereof, which lost part (11) forms a part of the end product, whereby as fence post this product can easily be provided with fixing members, for instance for fence wire mesh, and which end product is light in weight and easy to place in the ground. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 23/06; B28B 7/08; B28B 7/24; B28B 23/00; E04H 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/08 (2006.01); B28B 23/00 (2006.01); B28B 23/02 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 23/024 (2013.01); B28B 7/08 (2013.01); B28B 23/00 (2013.01); E04H 17/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020268 A2 20000719; EP 1020268 A3 20001004; NL 1010987 C2 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041009

2004-04-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A FENCE POST OF MOULDABLE MATERIAL, AND FENCE POST MANUFACTURED THEREWITH

2004-04-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A FENCE POST OF MOULDABLE MATERIAL, AND FENCE POST MAUFACTURED THEREWITH

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021220

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB LU NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI