Global Patent Index - EP 1020269 A2

EP 1020269 A2 2000-07-19 - Monitoring device for a mixing and conveying apparatus

Title (en)

Monitoring device for a mixing and conveying apparatus

Title (de)

Überwachungseinrichtung für eine Misch- und Förderanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance pour une installation de mélange et de transport

Publication

EP 1020269 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890007 A

Priority

AT 3699 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a measurement device (8) for the water being delivered (6) to the mixer and/or for the opening time of a delivery valve (7) for a known flow rate or for the operating time of a transport screw (3) or pump. The measurement device is connected to a data memory and computer (10) that determines and displays the quantity of mixture output, the residual quantity in the silo, the refilling requirement, etc.

Abstract (de)

Eine Überwachungseinrichtung für eine Misch- und Förderanlage (2), die an ein Baustoffsilo (1) angeschlossen ist, verfügt über ein Messgerät (8) für die Wassermenge oder die Öffnungdauer eines Wasserventils (7), wobei die Wassermenge über das vorgegebene Mischungsverhältnis mit dem Baustoff oder den Baustoffen in einem Rechner (10) zur Menge der verbrauchten Baustoffmischung (Mörtel, Beton) führt. Umgekehrt proportional dazu ist der Restfüllstand des Baustoffsilos (1). Das Messgerät (8) in der Anlage (2) ist mit einem Datenspeicher im Rechner (10) verbunden. Die Daten und bzw. oder das Rechenergebnis liegt an den Anschlüssen eines Steckers (12) für ein Anzeigegerät (11), das auch den Rechner (10) umfassen kann. Ferner kann die Anlage (2) über einen Sender (8) verfügen, der die Daten oder das Rechenergebnis zur Auswertung oder Anzeige an eine Zentrale (14) per Funk übermittelt. Es sind so Betriebsdauer, Pausen, Verbrauchsmengen, Restfüllstände und die Notwendigkeit von Servicearbeiten sowie des Nachfüllens des Silos (1) bzw. der Misch- und Förderanlage und die Qualität des Endproduktes bei mit aufgezeichneter Temperatur feststellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/00 (2006.01); B28C 7/04 (2006.01); B28C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/12 (2013.01); B28C 7/00 (2013.01); B28C 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020269 A2 20000719; EP 1020269 A3 20020717; AT 407672 B 20010525; AT A3699 A 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030118

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28C 7/00 A, 7B 28C 7/04 B, 7B 28C 7/12 B, 7B 01F 15/04 B, 7B 01F 15/00 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI