Global Patent Index - EP 1020270 A2

EP 1020270 A2 2000-07-19 - Adaptor for working joints for floor milling machine

Title (en)

Adaptor for working joints for floor milling machine

Title (de)

Fugenbearbeitungsgerät zu einer Bodenfräsmaschine

Title (fr)

Adapteur permettant la coupe-joint pour machine à fraiser le sol

Publication

EP 1020270 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125718 A

Priority

CH 8299 A

Abstract (en)

The jointing accessory for a floor-milling machine (20) is driven by the motor's main shaft of the floor-milling machine. The implement (5), such as wire brush, disc or saw, treating the joint (10) is enclosed by a flap-up protective cover (8) whose rotary point (12) is attached to the side of the floor-milling machine facing away from the implement. The cover is supported on the ground by a twin wheel (6) on the side facing the rotary point. The center of the twin wheel acts as rear guide-indicator. A twin wheel (7) acting as front guide-indicator is on an extension (11) to the side of the cover's rotary point.

Abstract (de)

In der voliegenden Schrift wird ein Fugenbearbeitungsgerät 1 als Zusatz zu einer Bodenfräsmaschine 20 vorgestellt. Eine Anbau- und abnehmbare Vorrichtung als Zusatzgerät wird an einer Bodenfräsmaschine 20 montiert. Der Motor 25, die ganze Antriebseinheit und das ganze Fahrgestell der Bodenfräsmaschine 20 dienen als Basisgerät im multifunktionalen Einsatz. Das Werkzeug 5 für die Reinigung von Fugen kann eine Drahtbürste, eine Diamantscheibe oder ein Sägeblatt sein. Der Wirkungsbereich des Fugenbearbeitungsgerätes ist 1 bis 15 cm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/18; E01C 23/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/18 (2006.01); E01C 23/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/0933 (2013.01); B28D 1/181 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020270 A2 20000719; EP 1020270 A3 20040114

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-11-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28D 1/18 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01C 23/09 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI