Global Patent Index - EP 1020287 A2

EP 1020287 A2 2000-07-19 - Engraved roller for the dosed ink supply in a rotary printing press

Title (en)

Engraved roller for the dosed ink supply in a rotary printing press

Title (de)

Rasterwalze zum dosierten Zuführen von Druckfarbe in einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Rouleau tramé pour l'alimentation dosée d'encre dans une machine à imprimer rotative

Publication

EP 1020287 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125078 A

Priority

DE 19901243 A

Abstract (en)

A color dosing print cylinder (1) is clad with an elastic sleeve which has a pattern of pockets (6) on the outer surface. each pocket has an elastic floor (8) with a void under each pocket. The voids are linked to variable pressures to increase and decrease the volume of the pockets and thereby adjust the color carrying capacity of the cylinder. A simple version has pockets in the outer surface of a solid cylinder and covered by a thin elastic sleeve, and with the pockets linked to a pressure/suction system.

Abstract (de)

Eine dosierbare Rasterwalze (1), insbesondere für ein Anilox-Farbwerk einer Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine mit einer auf der Umfangsoberfläche der Walze (1) angeordneten Vielzahl von Druckfarbe aufnehmenden Vertiefungen (6), zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß der Grund (8) der Vertiefungen (6) durch ein elastisches Material gebildet wird, und daß unterhalb der Vertiefungen (6) diesen zugeordnete Kammern (10) vorgesehen sind, die zur Vergrößerung oder Verkleinerung des Volumens der Vertiefungen (6) mit einem Druckmedium beaufschlagbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/26; B41N 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2006.01); B41N 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2013.01); B41N 7/06 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020287 A2 20000719; EP 1020287 A3 20011107; DE 19901243 A1 20000720; JP 2000202995 A 20000725; US 6308623 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOENBERGER, WOLFGANG

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPILGER, ROLF

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI