Global Patent Index - EP 1020300 A1

EP 1020300 A1 2000-07-19 - Ink jet media prepared from water-based formulation

Title (en)

Ink jet media prepared from water-based formulation

Title (de)

Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungsmaterial, das aus einer wässrigen Mischung hergestellt ist

Title (fr)

Matériau pour l'impression au jet d'encre préparé à partir d'une formulation aqueuse

Publication

EP 1020300 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300226 A

Priority

US 11567799 P

Abstract (en)

An ink jet printing medium has a top coat density of between 15 and 30 g/m<2>. The aqueous-based top coat formulation containing at least two aqueous gel forming polymers amounting to between 6 and 13 total weight percent of the formulation where the most hydrophilic polymer of the aqueous gel forming polymers is present in a weight ratio of between 4:1 and 2:1 relative to the least hydrophilic of the gel forming polymers. A binder polymer is also present in the formulation between 5 and 15 total weight percent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/5254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020300 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI