Global Patent Index - EP 1020303 A1

EP 1020303 A1 2000-07-19 - Process for obtaining a pattern on a glass surface

Title (en)

Process for obtaining a pattern on a glass surface

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Musters auf einer Glasoberfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé d'obtention d'un motif sur un substrat en matériau verrier

Publication

EP 1020303 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400080 A

Priority

FR 9900368 A

Abstract (en)

Creating a design on a glass substrate comprises depositing adhesive droplets and mineral particles, hardening an adhesive and heat-treating the product. A process for creating a design on a glass substrate comprises: (a) depositing one or more droplets of adhesive on one surface of the substrate by means of one or more nozzles that move parallel to the surface in a trajectory determined by the desired design; (b) depositing mineral particles comprising one or more glass frits on the surface; (c) hardening the adhesive droplets; (d) removing any mineral particles not stuck to the adhesive droplets; and (e) subjecting the substrate to one or more heat-treatment cycles, especially to fix the mineral particles.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé d'obtention d'un motif sur un substrat en matériau verrier. Selon l'invention, on réalise les étapes suivantes : a) on dépose sur une des faces du substrat, d'une ou plusieurs gouttelettes de colle à partir d'au moins une buse se déplaçant dans un plan sensiblement parallèle au substrat et selon une trajectoire déterminée par le motif à obtenir et d'une composition à base de particules minérales comportant au moins une fritte de verre ; b) on fait ou laisse durcir de la ou les gouttelette(s) de colle ; c) on élimine les particules minérales qui n'ont pas adhéré la ou les gouttelette(s) de colle ; e) on soumet ledit substrat à au moins un cycle de traitement thermique, notamment pour permettre la fixation desdites particules minérales. L'invention concerne également le substrat obtenu selon ce procédé et ses applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/02; B44F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/00 (2006.01); B41M 7/02 (2006.01); B44D 2/00 (2006.01); B44F 1/06 (2006.01); B41M 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44F 1/06 (2013.01); B41M 7/02 (2013.01); B44D 2/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

WO 9429115 A1 19941222 - BRAULT BENOIT [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020303 A1 20000719; FR 2788457 A1 20000721; FR 2788457 B1 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070801

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000205

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000205