Global Patent Index - EP 1020358 A1

EP 1020358 A1 2000-07-19 - Machine for filling boxes with arrays of containers, provided with rotating upright having two arms for transportation of the containers

Title (en)

Machine for filling boxes with arrays of containers, provided with rotating upright having two arms for transportation of the containers

Title (de)

Maschine zum Befüllen von Schachteln mit Gruppen von Behältern, mit einem rotierenden vertikalen Pfosten mit zwei Tragarmen zum Transport der Behälter

Title (fr)

Machine pour remplir des boîtes avec des groupes de récipients, muni d'un support rotatif vertical ayant deux bras de transport de récipients

Publication

EP 1020358 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200026 A

Priority

IT MI990043 A

Abstract (en)

Machine for filling boxes (3) with arrays of containers (1), which comprises a part (100) for supplying the containers (1), a part (200) for supplying the boxes (3) and devices (300) for gripping and transferring the containers (1) into the boxes (3), in which said devices (300) for transferring the containers comprise at least two arms (303a,303b) carrying the means (400) for gripping the containers and integral with an upright (301) which can be rotationally operated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020358 A1 20000719; IT 1308337 B1 20011211; IT MI990043 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021005

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RONCHI MARIO S.P A.

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RONCHI MARIO S.R.L.

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI