Global Patent Index - EP 1020363 A2

EP 1020363 A2 2000-07-19 - Method of and apparatus for sterilizing food packaging material

Title (en)

Method of and apparatus for sterilizing food packaging material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sterilisieren von Verpackungsmaterial für Lebensmittel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de stérilisation de matériau d'emballage pour produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 1020363 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300035 A

Priority

JP 546399 A

Abstract (en)

A sterilizing apparatus capable of sterilizing within a processing time corresponding to a line speed of a packing and packaging machine, as well as capable of preventing odoriferosity, deterioration of seal strength and scorching on printed surfaces caused by the irradiation of high power pulses under a high light emission energy in a case of applying a sterilizing method by using high power pulses from xenon lamps to the food packaging material is provided, wherein the apparatus comprises a means for depositing a liquid having an antibacterial function such as aqueous hydrogen peroxide at a low concentration to the food packaging material by spraying or immersion and a means for irradiating high power pulses using the xenon lamps to the food packaging material deposited with the liquid having the antibacterial effect. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/10 (2006.01); B65B 55/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020363 A2 20000719; EP 1020363 A3 20021016; JP 2000203535 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100803

2007-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071002

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 55/08 A, 7B 65B 55/10 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI