Global Patent Index - EP 1020364 A2

EP 1020364 A2 2000-07-19 - Packaging machine

Title (en)

Packaging machine

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 1020364 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100034 A

Priority

DE 19901235 A

Abstract (en)

The packing machine's device(9) for withdrawal and placing of the respective blanks(8), and the unit(10) for transporting the placed blanks, are vertically adjustable. The magazine(7) for the blanks may also be vertically adjustable. The conveyor unit has one or more carriers(2) which advance the product lying upon the support base(24) and are vertically adjustable. A vertically adjustable unit is provided for rotation and simultaneous feed of the packing of the partially packed product.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Verpackungsmaschine mit mindestens einer Fördervorrichtung (1, 2) zum Fördern des zu verpackenden Produktes (3) bzw. des teilweise oder ganz verpackten Produktes durch die Maschine. Oberhalb der Fördervorrichtung ist ein Magazin (7) zur Aufnahme einer Vielzahl von Verpackungszuschnitten (8) angeordnet, ferner ist oberhalb der Fördervorrichtung eine Vorrichtung (9) zum Entnehmen jeweils eines Zuschnitts aus dem Magazin und zum Plazieren dieses Zuschnitts oberhalb des Produkts vorgesehen. Eine Einrichtung (10) dient dem Fördern des oberhalb des Produkts plazierten Zuschnitts entsprechend der Förderbewegung des Produkts. Erfindungsgemäß wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Vorrichtung (9) zum Entnehmen und Plazieren des jeweiligen Zuschnitts (8) und die Einrichtung (10) zum Fördern des plazierten Zuschnitts (8) höhenverstellbar sind. Eine solche Verpackungsmaschine gestattet bei konstruktiv einfacher Gestaltung eine schnelle Umrüstung bezüglich unterschiedlich hoher Produkte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/005 (2013.01); B65B 59/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020364 A2 20000719; EP 1020364 A3 20020213; CA 2295356 A1 20000714; DE 19901235 A1 20000720; DE 19901235 B4 20050602

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI