Global Patent Index - EP 1020373 A2

EP 1020373 A2 2000-07-19 - Tubular frame for open-topped receptacles

Title (en)

Tubular frame for open-topped receptacles

Title (de)

Rohrgestell für oben offene Behälter

Title (fr)

Cadre tubulaire pour récipient à ouverture supérieure

Publication

EP 1020373 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100891 A

Priority

DE 19901680 A

Abstract (en)

The tubular frame has a hinged lid (11) and a bearing block (15) at the back. An operating rod (19) engages on a projection (23) on the hinge part (12) spaced from the hinged axis (16) and strikes the lid (11). A foot lever (18) mounted in the base area of the frame engages on the operating rod (19). The bearing block comprises an angular member whose horizontal arm is fixed by a screw clip (17) on a perpendicular support strut (9) leading to a support ring (10).

Abstract (de)

Rohrgestell für oben offene Behälter mit einem Klappdeckel (11), einem Scharnierteil (12) am Klappdeckel, einem an einer Rückseite des Rohrgestells angeordneten Lagerbock (15), einer an einem Fortsatz (23) am Scharnier beabstandet zur Scharnierachse (16) angreifenden den Klappdeckel aufstoßenden Betätigungsstange (19) und einem an der Betätigungsstange angreifenden, im Bodenbereich des Rohrgestells gelagerten Fußhebel (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/14; B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/14 (2006.01); B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1415 (2013.01); B65F 1/163 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020373 A2 20000719; EP 1020373 A3 20010620; EP 1020373 B1 20041124; AT 283217 T 20041215; DE 19964197 A1 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070118

2005-12-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FR

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-04-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT FR

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT FR

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI