Global Patent Index - EP 1020374 A1

EP 1020374 A1 2000-07-19 - Container for collecting contaminated waste

Title (en)

Container for collecting contaminated waste

Title (de)

Sammelbehälter für kontaminierten Abfall

Title (fr)

Récipient collecteur de déchets contaminés

Publication

EP 1020374 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120128 A

Priority

DE 19901269 A

Abstract (en)

The square container (1) has a lid (30) which when the container is filled is locked non-detachable by interacting catches. Spacers (15, 44) are provided which become active when the lid is fitted on in a rotationally locked position turned 90 degs. relative to the rotationally engaged position. This prevents premature fixing of the lid before the container is full to allow additional contents to be added. The spacers are stops set on the inside of the container just underneath its edge and interacting with corresponding seats (44) formed by flat indentations in the inner flanged edge of the lid on opposite sides.

Abstract (de)

Der quadratische Sammelbehälter 1 für kontaminierten Abfall hat einen Deckel 30, der nach Füllunq des Behälters mittels zusammenwirkender Verrastungselemente 11, 50 unlösbar aufgesetzt wird. Um ein vorzeitiges Einrasten zu verhindern, sind abstandshaltende Elemente 15,44; 48 vorgesehen, die wirksam sind, wenn der Deckel in einer gegenüber der Einrastdrehstellung um 90° verdrehten Sperrdrehstellung aufgesetzt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1615 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0658334 A1 19950621 - RIGLING HEINZ [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020374 A1 20000719; EP 1020374 B1 20040303; DE 19901269 A1 20000727; DE 19901269 C2 20010920

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071008

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908732 P 20040408

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI