Global Patent Index - EP 1020375 A1

EP 1020375 A1 2000-07-19 - Refuse collection vehicle with side loader.

Title (en)

Refuse collection vehicle with side loader.

Title (de)

Müllsammelfahrzeug mit seitlich angebrachter Ladevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Véhicule de ramassage d'ordures avec dispositif de chargement latéral

Publication

EP 1020375 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200032 A

Priority

NL 1011031 A

Abstract (en)

A refuse collection vehicle is provided with a loading device (8) for gripping, picking up, emptying and putting back down refuse containers (9). The loading device (8) is designed so that it can be moved towards a refuse container (9) which is to be emptied and comprises a movable lifting arm (10) which is mounted on the vehicle and is provided at its end with a gripping device (11) for gripping refuse containers (9). The gripping device (11) comprises a support part (12) which is attached to the end of the lifting arm (10), and a gripper member (13, 14) which is connected to the support part (12). The vehicle is furthermore provided with control means for controlling the loading device. The gripping device (11) is provided with a detection member (22) which is connected to the control means, is directed towards the working area (21) of the gripper member (13, 14) and is designed to signal the presence of a refuse container (9) in this area (21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2006.01); B65F 3/20 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2013.01); B65F 3/201 (2013.01); B65F 2003/023 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020375 A1 20000719; NL 1011031 C2 20000717

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI