Global patent index - EP 1020386 A2

EP 1020386 A2 2000-07-19 - Device for separating sheets of paper, plastic or similar materials

Title (en)

Device for separating sheets of paper, plastic or similar materials

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln von Zuschnitten aus Papier, Kunststoff oder ähnlichen Materialien

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer des feuilles de papier, en matière plastique ou similaires

Publication

EP 1020386 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123543 A

Priority

DE 29900725 U

Abstract (en)

The machine has a separating unit (3) delivering blanks (2) to the lower belt of the vacuum conveyor which is driven in cycles and the speed of conveyance of which is synchronized with that of the blank carrier. Pressure rollers (8), on the delivery end of the vacuum conveyor, lie on the carrier to freely run with it and are mounted on the direction reversal shaft of the conveyor. A sensor (6), adjacent the delivery area below the conveyor, controls the conveyor's cycling drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln und Aufbringen auf einen kontinuierlich bewegten Träger von Zuschnitten aus Papier, Kunststoff oder ähnlichen Materialien ist mit einer Vereinzelungsvorrichtung ausgerüstet, die die Zuschnitte einzeln an einen Vakuumförderer abgibt, an den sich der kontinuierlich bewegte Träger in Förderrichtung anschließt, der eine höhere Fördergeschwindigkeit als die Vereinzelungsvorrichtung aufweist. Damit ein positionsgenaues Ablegen der Zuschnitte auf eine mit hoher Geschwindigkeit kontinuierlich bewegte Oberfläche sichergestellt ist, gibt die Vereinzelungsvorrichtung (3) die Zuschnitte (2) an den Untergurt des Vakuumförderers (4) (über Kopf) ab, der taktweise angetrieben ist und dessen Fördergeschwindigkeit mit derjenigen des Trägers (1) synchronisierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/22; B65H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/12 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/224 (2013.01); B65H 3/124 (2013.01); B65H 2406/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900725 U1 19990325; EP 1020386 A2 20000719; EP 1020386 A3 20010613; US 6293535 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 39/14 A, 7B 65H 5/22 B, 7B 65H 3/04 B, 7B 65H 3/12 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI