Global Patent Index - EP 1020389 A2

EP 1020389 A2 2000-07-19 - Roll winding device

Title (en)

Roll winding device

Title (de)

Rollenwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enrouler des bandes

Publication

EP 1020389 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125492 A

Priority

DE 19901112 A

Abstract (en)

The winding roller has an associated cutter (12) mounted on a cutter support (13) which is fixed on retaining arms (17) which swivel about the rotational axis (19) of the support roller (2). The cutter support can be fixed for articulated movement with at least one retaining arm having a secondary drive (22) for changing the angle between arm and support.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Rollenwickelvorrichtung (1) zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn (8) zu einer Wickelrolle (5) angegeben mit einem Wickelbett (4), das durch mindestens eine Tragwalze (2) und mindestens eine weitere Rollenstütze (3) gebildet ist, und mit einer Trenneinrichtung (11), die ein auf einem Messerträger (13) angeordnetes Messer (12) aufweist, das zwischen einer Arbeitsstellung und einer Grundstellung verlagerbar ist. Hierbei möchte man den Trennvorgang verbessern können. Dazu ist der Messerträger (13) an Haltearmen (17) befestigt, die um die Rotationsachse (19) der Tragwalze (2) verschwenkbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/20; B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 19/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020389 A2 20000719; EP 1020389 A3 20000927; EP 1020389 B1 20040303; DE 19901112 A1 20000727; DE 19901112 B4 20040401; US 6322020 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041221

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021014

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI