Global Patent Index - EP 1020390 A2

EP 1020390 A2 2000-07-19 - Feeding calender in welding machines for plastic materials

Title (en)

Feeding calender in welding machines for plastic materials

Title (de)

Zuführkalander in Schweissmaschinen für plastisches Material

Title (fr)

Calandre d'alimentation dans des machines à souder pour matériau plastique

Publication

EP 1020390 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204427 A

Priority

IT MI990031 A

Abstract (en)

An instantaneously controlled feeding calender in welding machines for plastic materials, comprising an upper feeding cylinder (12) and a lower feeding cylinder (13) superimposed on each other and mounted on parallel axles, between which a plastic or thermoplastic film (14) is fed so as to form a bag or similar, a welding group downstream of the cylinders (12, 13) comprising an upper welding arm (15) and a lower welding arm (16), and a collecting area (18, 20, 21, 22) for finished bags (19), where each cylinder (12, 13) is equipped with an independent motor (27, 28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B31B 70/10 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020390 A2 20000719; EP 1020390 A3 20011219; IT 1306936 B1 20011011; IT MI990031 A1 20000712

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 20/02 A, 7B 31B 19/10 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI