Global Patent Index - EP 1020391 A1

EP 1020391 A1 2000-07-19 - Unit for and method of feeding a web unwound from a winding roll to a processing machine

Title (en)

Unit for and method of feeding a web unwound from a winding roll to a processing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuführen einer von einer Wickelrolle abgezogenen Materialbahn zu einer Verarbeitungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour alimenter une bande de matériau déroulée d'une bobine à une machine de traitement

Publication

EP 1020391 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124513 A

Priority

DE 19900536 A

Abstract (en)

For balancing out length variations the strip(2) is guided around a diverting arrangement(5) which can be moved in the direction of the moving strip. The position of the diverting roll is continuously varied by an adjusting member(7) linked to a control unit according to the changing unwinding roll diameter. An Independent claim is made for the process equipment which includes a controlled adjuster(7) for the diverting roll(5), a system for measuring the diameter of the unwinding roll(1) and a control unit.

Abstract (de)

Beim Zuführen einer von einer Wickelrolle (1) abgezogenen Materialbahn (2) zu einer Verarbeitungsmaschine ist es bekannt, die Materialbahn (2) nach dem Abwickeln zum Ausgleich von Längenschwankungen um eine Umlenkeinrichtung (5, 15) zu führen, die mit einer Komponente in Richtung der zulaufenden Materialbahn (2) bewegbar gelagert ist. Nach der Erfindung werden die Schwankungen im Durchmesser der Wickelrolle (1) kontinuierlich ermittelt. In Abhängigkeit von den Schwankungen im Wickelrollendurchmesser wird die Position der Umlenkeinrichtung (5, 15) von einer Steuereinrichtung über einen angeschlossenen Stellantrieb (7) gesteuert oder geregelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/04; B65H 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/048 (2013.01); B65H 2511/166 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/166 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900536 A1 20000713; EP 1020391 A1 20000719; EP 1020391 B1 20030502

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061209

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061209

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905311 P 20030605

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2003-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI