Global Patent Index - EP 1020394 A1

EP 1020394 A1 2000-07-19 - Device and method for simplifying the replacement of bearings on an escalator or moving walkway

Title (en)

Device and method for simplifying the replacement of bearings on an escalator or moving walkway

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren für vereinfachten Wälzlagertausch an Fahrtreppen und Fahrsteigen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour simplifier le remplacement des roulements sur un escalier ou trottoir roulant

Publication

EP 1020394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100341 A

Priority

  • EP 00100341 A
  • EP 99810018 A

Abstract (en)

The support structure (2) has suitably shaped secondary supports (9,10) on which the chain wheel assemblies (6) of the drive unit are fixed with detachable connectors. The central axial supports are fixed detachably on the support structure by screws. The central axis of the chain wheel assemblies is shaped so that it slides in the inner rings of the roller bearings (15) of the assemblies so far that these inner rings become accessible.

Abstract (de)

Fahrtreppen und Fahrsteige enthalten an der Tragkonstruktion (2) Hilfssupporte (9), an denen die Kettenräder-Baugruppe (6) der Antriebsstation mittels Distanzstücken (12) und Schrauben (11) starr fixiert werden kann, so dass die Achsträger der Kettenräder-Baugruppe entfernt und die Zentralachse (8) derart seitlich verschoben werden können, dass die dadurch zugänglich gewordenen Wälzlager (15) nach einem erfindungsgemässen Verfahren ausgetauscht werden können, ohne dass der Förderstrang aufgetrennt oder die Kettenräder-Baugruppe aus der Tragkonstruktion ausgebaut werden müssen. Die Fahrtreppen und Fahrsteige bleiben während der Lager-Austauschaktion begehbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/026 (2013.01); B66B 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] GB 1230270 A 19710428

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020394 A1 20000719; EP 1020394 B1 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002690 P 20030807

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI