Global Patent Index - EP 1020548 A2

EP 1020548 A2 2000-07-19 - Card clothing for flats of a carding machine

Title (en)

Card clothing for flats of a carding machine

Title (de)

Kratzenbelag für deckel einer Karde

Title (fr)

Garniture de carde pour chapeaux d'une machine de cardage

Publication

EP 1020548 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100677 A

Priority

DE 19901010 A

Abstract (en)

The wire clothing for a carding flat has at least one of the wires (30) with a length at the holding section (34) at least as long as at the working section (36) so that, preferably with at least one of the clothing wires (30), the ratio between the lengths of the holding (34) and working (36) sections is at least 3:1 and especially at least 5:1. With at least one of the clothing wires (30), the length of the working section (36) is 3 mm and preferably 1.5 mm at about 1 mm. The width of the clothing wire, at right angles to its longitudinal axis, is at least 0.2 mm and preferably at least 0.4 mm. The thickness of the clothing wire is 6 mm, on a plane at right angles to the longitudinal axis, and preferably 4.8 mm. The wire thickness:width ratio is 3. The clothing wire has a quadrilateral cross section at right angles to the longitudinal axis. The transit between the body of the clothing wire and its sharpened point is wholly within the card clothing carrier (10). One surface of the sharpened wire point is parallel to the longitudinal axis of the wire. The wire axis is pitched against the straight line from the tip through the carrier at an acute included angle of 5-30 degrees and preferably 5-20 degrees and especially at about 12 degrees , at the leading side (14) of the clothing carrier (10). The holding zone (12) of the carrier (10) transits into a mounting zone (16) at least at one edge, offset to the rear side (22) of the carrier (10) away from the wire working sections (36). The rear side (22) of the carrier (10) is parallel to the front side (14), and the front side (18) of the mounting zone (16) is parallel to the front side (14) of the carrier (10). A holder engages the front side (18) of the mounting zone (16), to press the carrier (10) against the surface of the card flat. Part of the holder passes through the mounting zone (16). At least one woven insert is embedded in the carrier, and preferably two woven layers are embedded in it, over each other and with a gap between them.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kratzenbelag für Deckel einer Karde mit einem Trägerelement und einer Anzahl von jeweils mit mindestens einem Aufnahmeabschnitt in dem Trägerelement aufgenommenen Kratzendrähten, von denen jeder mindestens einen außerhalb des Trägerelementes freiliegenden Bearbeitungsabschnitt aufweist, wird eine Weiterbildung vorgeschlagen, bei der bei mindestens einem der Kratzendrähte der Aufnahmeabschnitt mindestens genausolang ist wieder Bearbeitungsabschnitt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020548 A2 20000719; EP 1020548 A3 20010418; EP 1020548 B1 20031217; AT 256773 T 20040115; BR 0000050 A 20000905; TW 592222 U 20040611; US 6170124 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GRAF + CIE A.G.

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-03-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004754 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-01-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI