Global Patent Index - EP 1020554 A3

EP 1020554 A3 2001-01-10 - Device for designing knitwear made on a knitting machine

Title (en)

Device for designing knitwear made on a knitting machine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Entwurf von auf einer Strick- oder Wirkmaschine hergestellten Maschenerzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conception d'articles à mailles produits dans des machines à tricoter

Publication

EP 1020554 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100529 A

Priority

DE 19901542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020554A2] The apparatus has at least one memory to store the data for the knitting at the knitter, a display to show the design images of the knitting and at least one input to alter the images. The design images show at least one display for the stitches and a display to show the yarn movements which can be altered through the input unit. The apparatus to design a knitted product, produced on a knitter, has at least one memory (10) to store the data for the knitting at the knitter. It has at least one display to show the design images of the knitting and at least one input to alter the images. The design images show at least one display for the stitches (11) and a display to show the yarn movements (12) which can be altered through the input unit. When the image is altered at one display (11,12), the other display (12,11) is adjusted simultaneously to meet the changes. The two displays (11,12) are shown together and at the same time on a screen. A number of sections of one display (11) and/or the other display (12) are shown together and at the same time on at least one screen. The front and back sides of the knitting design of one display (11) and/or the other display are shown together and at the same time on at least one screen. The stitch display (11) gives a virtual reality presentation in three dimensions of all the elements of the stitching such as the stitches, the catch, and floats. The input unit allows changes to be made at each needle position to change the type, size and shape of the stitches in the display, and be related to the nature of the knitting yarn. The yarn movement display (12) has symbols for all the movements of the yarn at the needles, and the needle actions, such as in or out of use, stitch transfer and take-up, casting off and the like, together with the knitter operating parameters such as for the yarn guides and the slide movements, fabric take-off, needle bed racking, etc. The symbols for the yarn movement display (12), with the needle actions, can be combined into modules. The stitches in the stitch display (11) can also be combined into modules. The modules are stored in memory (10). The modules are taken from memory to be used as the knitting design, with a system which monitors that modules can only be used together in a structure which can be knitted at a knitting machine. The modules are brought together in their displays (11,12) to show the knitted fabric and the knitting execution, with defined threshold modules between the stitch and needle deployment displays for the fabric being designed. An overlay brings together several knitted rows of one display (11) and/or the other display (12) into a knitted row, giving a graphic correction on at least one display screen, together with a presentation of module repetitions and/or mirror images of the modules. The presentation of the modules can be enlarged on the display screen. The memory (10) has stored data for known Jacquard pattern structures to be shown as stitches and also the needle and yarn movement actions required. A generator provides the data to show the front and reverse sides of the Jacquard fabric patterning, and the input unit gives the user an interactive facility to convert the Jacquard pattern data into control data for the knitter. The memory (10) also holds data for most frequently used conversion algorithms between pattern and control data sets. The same memory (10) is used for data relating to the knitted stitches and the data for the needle actions and yarn movements to form the stitches.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 37/02 (2013.01); D04B 7/26 (2013.01); D04B 7/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020554 A2 20000719; EP 1020554 A3 20010110; EP 1020554 B1 20040721; EP 1020554 B2 20090722; AT 271620 T 20040815; CN 1238582 C 20060125; CN 1261112 A 20000726; DE 19901542 A1 20000817; DE 19901542 C2 20021010; ES 2223319 T3 20050301; HK 1028431 A1 20060915; PT 1020554 E 20041130; US 6611730 B1 20030826

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080114

2009-07-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090722

2009-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GR IT PT

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: H. *STOLL G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD.

2005-06-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD.

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2223319

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-01-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-12-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-14 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040402909

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-10-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLXE

- Free Format Text: PAT. BUL. 09/2004: PATENTNUMBER 1020554 SHOULD BE DELETED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 20040818/34)

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GR IT PT

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030620

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI