Global Patent Index - EP 1020555 A3

EP 1020555 A3 2001-03-14 - Device for retaining a covering element

Title (en)

Device for retaining a covering element

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Halterung eines Abschlusselementes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue d' un élément de couverture

Publication

EP 1020555 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100196 A

Priority

DE 19901431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020555A2] The assembly (1) to hold a closure in place at a column of textile packages, such as wound yarn bobbins and the like for processing, has at least one locking unit (3,4) which can be fitted in a positive and/or force fit at the end section (8) of the rod (9) forming the column. It swings on a footplate (2), with a passage opening (7) for the end section (8) of the rod (9). It is mounted so that at least one locking unit (3,4) is moved from the first position where it is locked at the end (8) of the rod (9) to swing into a second position where it is free of the rod end section (8), and vice versa. At least one locking unit (3,4) has a grip (5,5a) to give the swing movement. The footplate (2) has a sleeve (10) at right angles to it, at the passage opening (7), to hold a part section of the end (8) of the rod (9). The sleeve (10) is preferably at the opposite side of the footplate (2) to the locking units (3,4). The rod closure is also the footplate (2) for at least one locking unit (3,4). The lock (3,4) can swing through an angle of 90-170 degrees in relation to the footplate (2), and especially 110-150 degrees . At least one locking unit (3,4) is a plate-shaped lock, with an elongated hole (11,12) to hold the end section (8) of the rod (9). An edge (15,16) of the elongated hole (11,12) is shaped to apply a grip to the surface of the end section (8) of the rod (9). The footplate (2) carries two locking units (3,4), at opposite sides of the footplate (2) on swing mountings. They are linked together so that, when a swing movement is applied manually to one lock (3,4), the other lock swings as well. Each lock (3,4) has a plate shape with an elongated hole (11,12) so that an elongated hole holds the end section of the rod, while it is held in the other elongated hole, so that the facing inner edges (13) of the first hole (11) lie at the outer edges (14) of the other lock (4). One and/or other of the lock units (3,4) have a grip (5,5a). The inner edges (13) of the first hole (11) and/or the outer edges (14) of the other lock (4) work with limits (18,19) to define the range of the swing movements of both locks. The end section (8) of the rod (9) has a number of ratchets over it at axial intervals, formed by a threading over the rod end section (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020555 A2 20000719; EP 1020555 A3 20010314; DE 19901431 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010407

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI