Global patent index - EP 1020556 A2

EP 1020556 A2 2000-07-19 - Steam chamber, particularly in a steaming device for textile fabrics

Title (en)

Steam chamber, particularly in a steaming device for textile fabrics

Title (de)

Dampfraum, insbesondere in einem Dämpfer für textile Warenbahnen

Title (fr)

Chambre de vaporisage, notamment dans un dispositif pour le vaporisage des étoffes textiles

Publication

EP 1020556 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123405 A

Priority

DE 19900748 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly to steam fabric piecegoods has a system to determine the saturation level of the steam for use in the enclosed steaming zone (16) The steam saturation rate is established by the volume of fluid condensed from the steam in a given time span at a solid surface with a surface temperature below the evaporation point. A measurement unit (10) is calibrated before the steamer is operated, with the various steam saturation rates. An Independent claim is included for a textile fabric steamer with a measurement unit (10) to determine the saturation rate of the steam used for the steaming process in the steaming zone (16). Preferred Features: A solid body is in the steaming zone (16), with a surface temperature maintained below the steam evaporation point, for the steam to condense into droplets. The solid body is maintained at a constant temperature by a fluid carried in a pipe system (17) of a material with good thermal conductivity. The condensed droplets are caught by a funnel (30) with a catch cross section (19) matching the outline (27) of the unit. The pipes (17) within the outline are as coils, or in a serpentine structure and the like. The funnel (30) opens into a condensation collection channel (28), leading out through the wall (15) of the steaming zone (16) into a measurement station (29) where the volume of caught condensed fluid is measured.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Dämpfer (100) für die Behandlung textiler Warenbahnen (1) wird der Sättigungsgrad des in dem Dampfraum (16) vorhandenen Dampfes bestimmt, indem die in einer Zeiteinheit an einem in dem Dampfraum (16) angebrachten, auf einer konstanten unterhalb der Verdampfungstemperatur gelegenen Temperatur gehaltenen Festkörper (20) kondensierende Flüssigkeitsmenge gemessen wird (Fig. 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 17/00; D06B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 17/00 (2006.01); D06B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 19/0035 (2013.01); D06B 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020556 A2 20000719; EP 1020556 A3 20010117; DE 19900748 A1 20000720; DE 19900748 C2 20010308

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI