Global Patent Index - EP 1020562 A1

EP 1020562 A1 2000-07-19 - Frog with movable point and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Frog with movable point and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Herzstück mit beweglicher Spitze und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Coeur de croisement à pointe mobile et procédé de fabrication d'un tel coeur de croisement

Publication

EP 1020562 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400064 A

Priority

FR 9900398 A

Abstract (en)

The crossing comprises a cradle rocker assembly (11) whose extreme ends correspond to the point heels. Two welded rail sections (111,112) are located at the extremities. A mobile points section (2) is mounted prior to the rocker cradle assembly, each rail section being welded and secured to sleepers (141,151). An Independent claim is included for a method of manufacturing a common railway crossing point.

Abstract (fr)

Le coeur de croisement comporte un ensemble (1) de berceau comprenant un berceau (11) ayant deux extrémités respectivement de pointe et de talon ; deux coupons (12, 13) de rails sont soudés à deux régions (111, 112) de l'extrémité de pointe et deux éléments de talon (14, 15) à deux régions (113, 114) de l'extrémité de talon ; les éléments de talon comportent d'une pièce des platines (141, 151) de base, des entretoises munies d'éclisses, et des butées. Une pointe mobile (2) encastrée entre les éclisses est fixée à elles au moyen de colle et d'organes filetés. Des plaques d'appui et de glissement sont soudées aux platines (141, 151) pour supporter la pointe. L'invention est utilisable dans les appareils de voie de grande longueur à faible angle de croisement, dans des voies en barre longue pour trafic à grande et très grande vitesse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020562 A1 20000719; FR 2788535 A1 20000721; FR 2788535 B1 20010504

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGIFER

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI