Global Patent Index - EP 1020565 A3

EP 1020565 A3 2001-12-05 - Arrangement for distributing a binding agent and cleaning apparatus comprising such an arrangement

Title (en)

Arrangement for distributing a binding agent and cleaning apparatus comprising such an arrangement

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Ausbringen eines Bindemittels und Reinigungsvorrichtung mit einer solchen Anordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement d'épandage d'un liant et dispositif de nettoyage comportant un tel agencement

Publication

EP 1020565 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100321 A

Priority

  • DE 19900880 A
  • DE 19906750 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020565A2] Binding medium is fed through the delivery opening of a distribution device located outside the delivery opening. The distribution unit through a movement around an axis(DA) throws the binding material centrifugally away from the axis onto the surface to be treated. The distribution device has a scatter plate arrangement with a scatter plate rotating around an axis and equipped with a spreading disc(SS) and has distribution blades(WSS) protruding from it. The axis of the scatter plate is inclined preferably by an angle(NW) of 10-30 degrees to the vertical. An Independent claim is included for a mobile cleaning device used in combination with the proposed distribution system and a container for binding medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/20; E01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/20 (2006.01); E01H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/203 (2013.01); E01C 19/201 (2013.01); E01H 1/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020565 A2 20000719; EP 1020565 A3 20011205; CA 2295246 A1 20000712; DE 10001016 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI