Global Patent Index - EP 1020567 A1

EP 1020567 A1 2000-07-19 - Device for separating and transporting of solid matter from running water, in particular sewage

Title (en)

Device for separating and transporting of solid matter from running water, in particular sewage

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden und Herausfördern von Abscheidegut aus einer strömenden Flüssigkeit, insbesondere Abwasser

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer et transporter des déchets d' eaux courantes, particulièrement d'eaux usées

Publication

EP 1020567 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99126105 A

Priority

DE 19900817 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. to separate matter from a fluid flow, and especially sewage, is a grid inserted into the flowing fluid (5) with parallel blades (1,2) alternating as moving and fixed blades arranged as a packet (3) of fixed blades (1) and a packet (4) of moving blades (2). The movement path (21) of the drive for the second blade packet (4) has an elliptical shape with structured steps (8). The tread section (9) of the steps (8) of the moving blades (2) lies below the level of the tread section of the steps of the fixed blades (1) during a horizontal forward movement, against the direction (7) of the fluid flow. The tread of the moving blade step (2) is not covered by the tread of the fixed blade (1) step during its return movement. The tread section (9) of the step (8) of the moving blade (2) is not covered by the riser section (10) of the fixed blade (1) during the upwards movement and, during the downwards movement, it is covered behind the riser section (10) of the fixed blade (1) step (8).

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden und Herausfördern von Abscheidegut aus einer strömenden Flüssigkeit, insbesondere Abwasser, ist mit einem in die Flüssigkeit (5) eintauchenden Rost aus parallel zueinander vorgesehenen und jeweils im Wechsel ortsfest und beweglich angeordneten Lamellen (1, 2) versehen. Die ortsfest angeordneten Lamellen (1) sind zu einem ersten Lamellenpaket (3) und die beweglich angeordneten Lamellen (2) zu einen zweiten Lamellenpaket (4) zusammengefasst. Sämtliche Lamellen (1, 2) weisen auf der der Strömungsrichtung (7) zugekehrten Fläche eine Vielzahl von Stufen (8) mit einem Trittstufenanteil (9) und einem Setzstufenanteil (10) auf. Der Trittstufenanteil (9) und/oder der Setzstufenanteil (10) weist eine Hinterschneidung (11) auf. Es ist ein Antrieb (25) für das zweite Lamellenpaket (4) in einer geschlossenen Bewegungsbahn (21) in der Haupterstreckungsebene der Lamellen (1, 2) vorgesehen. Die aufwärts gerichtete Bewegungskomponente der Bewegungsbahn (21) ist etwas größer als die vertikale Höhe der Stufen (8) der Lamellen (1, 2) bemessen. Die Bewegungsbahn (21) des Antriebes für das zweite Lamellenpaket (4) ist ellipsenförmig oder ellipsenartig ausgebildet und der Gestalt der Stufen (8) folgend so an- und zugeordnet, daß der Trittstufenanteil (9) der Stufen (8) der beweglichen Lamellen (2) während der horizontalen Vorwärtsbewegung entgegen der Strömungsrichtung (7) unter dem Trittstufenanteil (9) der Stufen (8) der ortsfesten Lamellen (1) verdeckt bleibt und während der horizontalen Rückbewegung von einer Überdeckung mit dem Trittstufenanteil (9) der Stufen (8) der ortsfesten Lamellen (1) freibleibt. Der Trittstufenanteil (9) der Stufen (8) der beweglichen Lamellen (2) bleibt während der Aufwärtsbewegung von einer Überdeckung mit dem Setzstufenanteil (10) der Stufen (8) der ortsfesten Lamellen (2) frei und während der Abwärtsbewegung hinter dem Setzstufenanteil (10) der Stufen (8) der ortsfesten Lamellen (2) verdeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 8/02; E03F 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 5/08 (2006.01); E02B 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 8/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020567 A1 20000719; EP 1020567 B1 20040526; AT 267922 T 20040615; AU 1004000 A 20000713; AU 764538 B2 20030821; CA 2293892 A1 20000712; CA 2293892 C 20070605; DE 19900817 A1 20000727; DE 19900817 B4 20040415; ES 2219993 T3 20041201; JP 2000204533 A 20000725; US 6231757 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909581

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HANS *HUBER A.G. MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041026

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041230

2005-12-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-12-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041230

2004-12-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219993 T3

2004-11-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-09-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909581 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030402

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HANS HUBER AG MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI