Global Patent Index - EP 1020576 A2

EP 1020576 A2 2000-07-19 - Fassade or glazed roof with a framework of mullion and transom profiles

Title (en)

Fassade or glazed roof with a framework of mullion and transom profiles

Title (de)

Fassade oder Lichtdach mit einem Rahmenwerk aus Pfosten- und Sprossenprofilen

Title (fr)

Façade ou toiture vitrée avec une ossature formée de potaux et de traverses profilés

Publication

EP 1020576 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100404 A

Priority

DE 29900769 U

Abstract (en)

At the butt joint (B) between the cross piece (5) forming the upper boundary and an upright section (6), the base of the channels receiving draining water overlaps the anchoring groove of the cross piece for a sealing strip and bears on the anchoring groove. Water flows from the upright section into the channel of the cross piece. At all further butt joints between uprights and cross piece section (1,2,3,4), the base of the channels for water of one facade section overlap the anchoring groove for sealing strips of the other facade section.

Abstract (de)

Die Fassade oder das Lichtdach ist mit einem Rahmenwerk aus Pfosten- (6) und Sprossenprofilen (5) versehen, die mittig eine Schraubnut für Befestigungsschrauben von am Außenrand von Glasscheiben oder Füllungsplatten sich über Dichtungen abstützenden Abdeckleisten aufweisen. An den Längsrändern der Pfosten- und Sprossenprofile sind Verankerungsnuten für Dichtungsleisten vorgesehen, an denen die Innenränder der Glasscheiben- oder Füllungsplatten aufliegen. Die Schraubnut und die Verankerungsnuten begrenzen Aufnahmerinnen für von außen in die Konstruktion eindringendes Sickerwasser. Um an allen Stoßverbindungen zwischen den Pfostenprofilen (6) und den Sprossenprofilen (5) die Überleitung des Sickerwassers von einem Fassadenprofil zum anderen ohne Verwendung zusätzlicher Bauteile vornehmen zu können, überlappt der Boden der Aufnahmerinnen für das Sickerwasser des Pfostenprofils (6) endseitig die Verankerungsnut des Sprossenprofils (5) für eine Dichtungsleiste und liegt auf der Verankerungsnut auf. Das Sickerwasser vom Pfostenprofil (6) fließt somit in die Aufnahmerinne für das Sickerwasser des Sprossenprofils (5). Bei allen weiteren Stoßverbindungen zwischen den Pfosten- und den Sprossenprofilen (1, 2; 3, 4) sind die Böden der Aufnahmerinnen für das Sickerwasser des einen Fassadenprofils auf die Verankerungsnut für Dichtungsleisten des anderen Fassadenprofils überlappend aufgelagert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E04B 2/965 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0806 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900769 U1 19990429; AT 268847 T 20040615; CN 100366835 C 20080206; CN 1261639 A 20000802; DK 1020576 T3 20040816; EA 002239 B1 20020228; EA 200000033 A2 20000828; EA 200000033 A3 20001225; EP 1020576 A2 20000719; EP 1020576 A3 20010912; EP 1020576 B1 20040609; ES 2220259 T3 20041216; HK 1030035 A1 20080725; NO 20000218 A 20000719; NO 20000218 D0 20000117; NO 319418 B1 20050808; PL 201511 B1 20090430; PL 337884 A1 20000731; PT 1020576 E 20040930; UA 72188 C2 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20151203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-09-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20090121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220259 T3

2004-10-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402563

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006710 P 20040715

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000108;LV PAYMENT 20000108

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020112

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000108;LV PAYMENT 20000108;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000108;LV PAYMENT 20000108;MK;RO;SI