Global Patent Index - EP 1020582 A2

EP 1020582 A2 2000-07-19 - Facade system

Title (en)

Facade system

Title (de)

Fassadensystem

Title (fr)

Sytème de façade

Publication

EP 1020582 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250433 A

Priority

DE 19902890 A

Abstract (en)

The facade system has a frame (2) which is a part of the facade component (1) and also surrounds it. The frame (2) is composed of profile carriers (6), with a center mounting groove (8) at the outer sides of the vertical and/or horizontal carriers (6). The grooves (8) carry covered mountings, such as wedges, to lock into adjacent facade components or to the building. The profile carriers (6) are of shaped steel or a light metal. The facade elements (3a-3d) in the frame are glass panes, or plates of metal or plastics.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Fassadensystem, bestehend aus einzelnen Fassadenelementen, einem Rahmen und zumindest einem im wesentlichen rechteckigen Füllelement, eine schnelle und einfache Montage an einem Gebäude zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Rahmen (2) Teil des Fassadenelementes (1) ist und dieses umgibt und daß der Rahmen aus Profilträgern (6) gebildet ist, von denen die senkrechten und/oder die waagerechten Profilträger eine im wesentlichen mittig auf der Profilträgeraußenseite (7) verlaufende Befestigungsnut (8) aufweisen, in der Mittel zum Verbinden mit einem benachbarten Fassadenelement (1) oder Gebäudeteil verdeckt untergebracht sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/962 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4140458 A1 19930609

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020582 A2 20000719; EP 1020582 A3 20010919; DE 19902890 A1 20000907; PL 337869 A1 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/96 A, 7E 04B 2/90 B, 7E 06B 3/54 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI